Constitution Committee
29th Oct 2019 - 31st Jan 2023
International Relations and Defence Committee
25th May 2016 - 1st Jul 2019
Soft Power Committee
16th May 2013 - 11th Mar 2014
Minister of State (Foreign and Commonwealth Office) (International Energy Policy)
12th May 2010 - 6th Sep 2012
Shadow Minister (Foreign and Commonwealth Affairs)
1st Jul 2000 - 6th May 2010
Shadow Deputy Leader of the House of Lords
8th Jun 2005 - 6th May 2010
Procedure and Privileges Committee
15th Jun 2005 - 18th Nov 2006
European Union Committee
3rd Dec 1998 - 30th Nov 2000
Foreign Affairs Committee
26th Feb 1986 - 21st Mar 1997
Foreign Affairs Committee
1st Jan 1987 - 21st Mar 1997
Liaison Committee (Commons)
17th Jun 1987 - 21st Mar 1997
Secretary of State for Transport
14th Sep 1981 - 11th Jun 1983
Secretary of State for Energy
5th May 1979 - 13th Sep 1981
Shadow Minister (Business, Innovation and Skills)
1st Jul 1977 - 3rd May 1979
Minister of State (Department of Energy)
8th Jan 1974 - 4th Mar 1974
Minister of State (Northern Ireland Office)
5th Nov 1972 - 8th Jan 1974
Parliamentary Under-Secretary (Northern Ireland Office)
26th Mar 1972 - 5th Nov 1972
Parliamentary Under-Secretary (Department of Employment)
5th Jan 1971 - 26th Mar 1972
Parliamentary Secretary (Civil Service Department)
20th Jun 1970 - 26th Mar 1972
Lord Commissioner (HM Treasury) (Whip)
20th Jun 1970 - 5th Jan 1971