Question to the Scotland Office:
To ask the Secretary of State for Scotland, if he will provide (a) a list of the Ministers in his Department who have been appointed from the House of Lords and (b) the length of their period in office since 2000.
Since 2000, the following Lords have been appointed to the Office of the Secretary of State for Scotland:
Lord Offord of Garvel – 4 October 2021 to present (Ennobled 14 October 2021)
Lord Duncan of Springbank – 15 June 2017 to 27 July 2019
Lord Dunlop – 14 May 2015 to 14 June 2017
Lord Foulkes of Cumnock – 26 January 2001 to 29 May 2002